Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB402 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Eltife S.B. No. 402
22 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
44 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 13,
55 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the authority of the voters of a municipality or a
1111 county to adopt a one-quarter cent sales and use tax in the
1212 municipality or county to provide property tax relief.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 3, Tax Code, is amended by
1515 adding Chapter 326 to read as follows:
1616 CHAPTER 326. MUNICIPAL AND COUNTY SALES AND USE TAX FOR PROPERTY
1717 TAX RELIEF
1818 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
1919 Sec. 326.001. APPLICABLE LAW. Except as otherwise provided
2020 by this chapter:
2121 (1) Chapter 321 applies to the municipal tax
2222 authorized by this chapter in the same manner as that chapter
2323 applies to the tax authorized by that chapter; and
2424 (2) Chapter 323 applies to the county tax authorized
2525 by this chapter in the same manner as that chapter applies to the
2626 tax authorized by that chapter.
2727 Sec. 326.002. EFFECT ON COMBINED LOCAL TAX RATE.
2828 (a) Sections 321.101 and 323.101 do not apply to the municipal or
2929 county tax authorized by this chapter.
3030 (b) The rate of a municipal or county sales and use tax
3131 imposed under this chapter may not be considered in determining the
3232 combined or overlapping rate of local sales and use taxes in any
3333 area under this subtitle or another law, including:
3434 (1) the Health and Safety Code;
3535 (2) the Local Government Code;
3636 (3) the Special District Local Laws Code; or
3737 (4) the Transportation Code.
3838 [Sections 326.003-326.050 reserved for expansion]
3939 SUBCHAPTER B. IMPOSITION OF TAX
4040 Sec. 326.051. TAX AUTHORIZED. (a) A municipality or a
4141 county may adopt or abolish the sales and use tax authorized by this
4242 chapter at an election held in the municipality or county.
4343 (b) The adoption of the tax authorized by this chapter by
4444 one political subdivision does not affect the authority of another
4545 political subdivision that has overlapping boundaries to also adopt
4646 the tax authorized by this chapter.
4747 Sec. 326.052. TAX RATE. The rate of the tax authorized by
4848 this chapter is one-fourth of one percent.
4949 Sec. 326.053. SALES AND USE TAX EFFECTIVE DATE. (a) The
5050 adoption or abolition of the tax takes effect on the first day of
5151 the first calendar quarter occurring after the expiration of the
5252 first complete calendar quarter occurring after the date on which
5353 the comptroller receives a notice of the results of the election
5454 from the municipality or county.
5555 (b) If the comptroller determines that an effective date
5656 provided by Subsection (a) will occur before the comptroller can
5757 reasonably take the action required to begin collecting the tax or
5858 to implement the abolition of the tax, the effective date may be
5959 extended by the comptroller until the first day of the next
6060 succeeding calendar quarter.
6161 [Sections 326.054-326.100 reserved for expansion]
6262 SUBCHAPTER C. TAX ELECTION PROCEDURES
6363 Sec. 326.101. CALLING ELECTION. (a) An election
6464 authorized by this chapter in a municipality is called by the
6565 adoption of an ordinance by the governing body of the municipality.
6666 (b) An election authorized by this chapter in a county is
6767 called by the adoption of an order by the commissioners court of the
6868 county.
6969 Sec. 326.102. ELECTION DATE. An election under this
7070 chapter must be held on the next uniform election date that occurs
7171 after the date of the election order and that allows sufficient time
7272 to comply with the requirements of other law.
7373 Sec. 326.103. BALLOT. (a) At an election to adopt the tax,
7474 the ballot shall be prepared to permit voting for or against the
7575 proposition: "The adoption of a local sales and use tax in (name of
7676 municipality or county) at the rate of one-fourth of one percent to
7777 reduce the (municipal or county) property tax rate."
7878 (b) At an election to abolish the tax, the ballot shall be
7979 prepared to permit voting for or against the proposition: "The
8080 abolition of the one-fourth of one percent sales and use tax in
8181 (name of municipality or county) used to reduce the (municipal or
8282 county) property tax rate."
8383 [Sections 326.104-326.150 reserved for expansion]
8484 SUBCHAPTER D. USE OF TAX REVENUE
8585 Sec. 326.151. USE OF REVENUE. Any amount derived by a
8686 municipality or county from the sales and use tax under this chapter
8787 is additional sales and use tax revenue for purposes of Section
8888 26.041.
8989 Sec. 326.152. CALCULATION OF MUNICIPAL OR COUNTY ROLLBACK
9090 TAX RATE. For a municipality or county in which the voters have
9191 approved the imposition of the sales and use tax under this chapter,
9292 for an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the date the sales
9393 and use tax takes effect, in the formula for calculating the
9494 rollback tax rate of the municipality or county, the officer or
9595 employee designated by the governing body of the municipality or
9696 the commissioners court of the county to make the calculation shall
9797 substitute 1.05 for 1.08.
9898 SECTION 2. Subdivision (1), Section 26.012, Tax Code, is
9999 amended to read as follows:
100100 (1) "Additional sales and use tax" means an additional
101101 sales and use tax imposed by:
102102 (A) a municipality [city] under Section
103103 321.101(b) or Chapter 326;
104104 (B) a county under Chapter 323 or 326; or
105105 (C) a hospital district, other than a hospital
106106 district created on or after September 1, 2001, that:
107107 (i) imposes the sales and use tax under
108108 Subchapter I, Chapter 286, Health and Safety Code; or
109109 (ii) imposes the sales and use tax under
110110 Subchapter L, Chapter 285, Health and Safety Code.
111111 SECTION 3. Subsection (i), Section 31.01, Tax Code, is
112112 amended to read as follows:
113113 (i) For a municipality [city or town] that imposes an
114114 additional sales and use tax under Section 321.101(b) or Chapter
115115 326 [of this code], or a county that imposes a sales and use tax
116116 under Chapter 323 or 326 [of this code], the tax bill shall indicate
117117 the amount of additional ad valorem taxes, if any, that would have
118118 been imposed on the property if additional ad valorem taxes had been
119119 imposed in an amount equal to the amount of revenue estimated to be
120120 collected from the additional municipal [city] sales and use tax or
121121 from the county sales and use tax, as applicable, for the year
122122 determined as provided by Section 26.041 [of this code].
123123 SECTION 4. Sections 2 and 3 of this Act apply only to ad
124124 valorem taxes that are imposed for an ad valorem tax year that
125125 begins on or after January 1, 2010.
126126 SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
127127 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
128128 (b) Sections 2 and 3 of this Act take effect January 1, 2010.
129129 * * * * *