Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB402 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife S.B. No. 402
 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 13,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the voters of a municipality or a
 county to adopt a one-quarter cent sales and use tax in the
 municipality or county to provide property tax relief.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 3, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 326 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 326. MUNICIPAL AND COUNTY SALES AND USE TAX FOR PROPERTY
 TAX RELIEF
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 326.001.  APPLICABLE LAW.  Except as otherwise provided
 by this chapter:
 (1)  Chapter 321 applies to the municipal tax
 authorized by this chapter in the same manner as that chapter
 applies to the tax authorized by that chapter; and
 (2)  Chapter 323 applies to the county tax authorized
 by this chapter in the same manner as that chapter applies to the
 tax authorized by that chapter.
 Sec. 326.002.  EFFECT ON COMBINED LOCAL TAX RATE.
 (a)  Sections 321.101 and 323.101 do not apply to the municipal or
 county tax authorized by this chapter.
 (b)  The rate of a municipal or county sales and use tax
 imposed under this chapter may not be considered in determining the
 combined or overlapping rate of local sales and use taxes in any
 area under this subtitle or another law, including:
 (1) the Health and Safety Code;
 (2) the Local Government Code;
 (3) the Special District Local Laws Code; or
 (4) the Transportation Code.
 [Sections 326.003-326.050 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER B. IMPOSITION OF TAX
 Sec. 326.051.  TAX AUTHORIZED.  (a)  A municipality or a
 county may adopt or abolish the sales and use tax authorized by this
 chapter at an election held in the municipality or county.
 (b)  The adoption of the tax authorized by this chapter by
 one political subdivision does not affect the authority of another
 political subdivision that has overlapping boundaries to also adopt
 the tax authorized by this chapter.
 Sec. 326.052.  TAX RATE. The rate of the tax authorized by
 this chapter is one-fourth of one percent.
 Sec. 326.053.  SALES AND USE TAX EFFECTIVE DATE.  (a)  The
 adoption or abolition of the tax takes effect on the first day of
 the first calendar quarter occurring after the expiration of the
 first complete calendar quarter occurring after the date on which
 the comptroller receives a notice of the results of the election
 from the municipality or county.
 (b)  If the comptroller determines that an effective date
 provided by Subsection (a) will occur before the comptroller can
 reasonably take the action required to begin collecting the tax or
 to implement the abolition of the tax, the effective date may be
 extended by the comptroller until the first day of the next
 succeeding calendar quarter.
 [Sections 326.054-326.100 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER C. TAX ELECTION PROCEDURES
 Sec. 326.101.  CALLING ELECTION.  (a)  An election
 authorized by this chapter in a municipality is called by the
 adoption of an ordinance by the governing body of the municipality.
 (b)  An election authorized by this chapter in a county is
 called by the adoption of an order by the commissioners court of the
 county.
 Sec. 326.102.  ELECTION DATE.  An election under this
 chapter must be held on the next uniform election date that occurs
 after the date of the election order and that allows sufficient time
 to comply with the requirements of other law.
 Sec. 326.103.  BALLOT.  (a)  At an election to adopt the tax,
 the ballot shall be prepared to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The adoption of a local sales and use tax in (name of
 municipality or county) at the rate of one-fourth of one percent to
 reduce the (municipal or county) property tax rate."
 (b)  At an election to abolish the tax, the ballot shall be
 prepared to permit voting for or against the proposition:  "The
 abolition of the one-fourth of one percent sales and use tax in
 (name of municipality or county) used to reduce the (municipal or
 county) property tax rate."
 [Sections 326.104-326.150 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER D. USE OF TAX REVENUE
 Sec. 326.151.  USE OF REVENUE.  Any amount derived by a
 municipality or county from the sales and use tax under this chapter
 is additional sales and use tax revenue for purposes of Section
 26.041.
 Sec. 326.152.  CALCULATION OF MUNICIPAL OR COUNTY ROLLBACK
 TAX RATE. For a municipality or county in which the voters have
 approved the imposition of the sales and use tax under this chapter,
 for an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the date the sales
 and use tax takes effect, in the formula for calculating the
 rollback tax rate of the municipality or county, the officer or
 employee designated by the governing body of the municipality or
 the commissioners court of the county to make the calculation shall
 substitute 1.05 for 1.08.
 SECTION 2. Subdivision (1), Section 26.012, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Additional sales and use tax" means an additional
 sales and use tax imposed by:
 (A) a municipality [city] under Section
 321.101(b) or Chapter 326;
 (B) a county under Chapter 323 or 326; or
 (C) a hospital district, other than a hospital
 district created on or after September 1, 2001, that:
 (i) imposes the sales and use tax under
 Subchapter I, Chapter 286, Health and Safety Code; or
 (ii) imposes the sales and use tax under
 Subchapter L, Chapter 285, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (i), Section 31.01, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (i) For a municipality [city or town] that imposes an
 additional sales and use tax under Section 321.101(b) or Chapter
 326 [of this code], or a county that imposes a sales and use tax
 under Chapter 323 or 326 [of this code], the tax bill shall indicate
 the amount of additional ad valorem taxes, if any, that would have
 been imposed on the property if additional ad valorem taxes had been
 imposed in an amount equal to the amount of revenue estimated to be
 collected from the additional municipal [city] sales and use tax or
 from the county sales and use tax, as applicable, for the year
 determined as provided by Section 26.041 [of this code].
 SECTION 4. Sections 2 and 3 of this Act apply only to ad
 valorem taxes that are imposed for an ad valorem tax year that
 begins on or after January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Sections 2 and 3 of this Act take effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *