House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
01/07/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|