Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 44


 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of students in funding awarded under
 the advanced research program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 142.001, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (3) and adding Subdivision (3-a) to read as
 follows:
 (3) "Eligible institution" means an institution of
 higher education[, as defined by Section 61.003(8) of this code].
 (3-a)  "Institution of higher education" and "medical
 and dental unit" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 SECTION 2. Section 142.002, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 142.002. PURPOSE. The advanced research program is
 established to encourage and provide support for basic research
 conducted by faculty members and students in astronomy, atmospheric
 science, biological and behavioral sciences, chemistry, computer
 sciences, earth sciences, engineering, information science,
 mathematics, material sciences, oceanography, physics,
 environmental issues affecting the Texas-Mexico border region, the
 reduction of industrial, agricultural, and domestic water use,
 social sciences, and related disciplines in eligible institutions.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (c), Section 142.003, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The guidelines and procedures developed by the
 coordinating board must:
 (1) provide for awards on a competitive, peer review
 basis for specific projects at eligible institutions; and
 (2)  require that, as a condition of receiving an
 award, an eligible institution must use a portion of the award to
 support, in connection with the project for which the award is made,
 basic research conducted by:
 (A)  graduate or undergraduate students, if the
 eligible institution is a medical and dental unit; or
 (B)  undergraduate students, if the eligible
 institution is any other institution of higher education.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 44 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor