E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4978
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4978
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6012
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1549
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4496
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 266
|
Senate
|
01/28/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 58
|
Senate
|
01/15/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|