1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 488 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the operation of a motor vehicle in the vicinity of a |
---|
6 | 6 | | vulnerable road user; providing penalties. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 545, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | 9 | | is amended by adding Section 545.428 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 545.428. VULNERABLE ROAD USERS. (a) In this section, |
---|
11 | 11 | | "vulnerable road user" means: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) a pedestrian, including a runner, physically |
---|
13 | 13 | | disabled person, child, skater, highway construction and |
---|
14 | 14 | | maintenance worker, tow truck operator, utility worker, other |
---|
15 | 15 | | worker with legitimate business in or near the road or |
---|
16 | 16 | | right-of-way, or stranded motorist or passenger; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) a person on horseback; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) a person operating equipment other than a motor |
---|
19 | 19 | | vehicle, including a bicycle, handcycle, horse-driven conveyance, |
---|
20 | 20 | | or unprotected farm equipment; or |
---|
21 | 21 | | (4) a person operating a motorcycle, moped, |
---|
22 | 22 | | motor-driven cycle, or motor-assisted scooter. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) An operator of a motor vehicle passing a vulnerable road |
---|
24 | 24 | | user operating on a highway or street shall: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) vacate the lane in which the vulnerable road user |
---|
26 | 26 | | is located if the highway has two or more marked lanes running in |
---|
27 | 27 | | the same direction; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) pass the vulnerable road user at a safe distance. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (c) For the purposes of Subsection (b)(2), when road |
---|
30 | 30 | | conditions allow, safe distance is at least: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) three feet if the operator's vehicle is a passenger |
---|
32 | 32 | | car or light truck; or |
---|
33 | 33 | | (2) six feet if the operator's vehicle is a truck other |
---|
34 | 34 | | than a light truck or a commercial motor vehicle as defined by |
---|
35 | 35 | | Section 522.003. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (d) An operator of a motor vehicle that is making a left turn |
---|
37 | 37 | | at an intersection, including an intersection with an alley or |
---|
38 | 38 | | private road or driveway, shall yield the right-of-way to a |
---|
39 | 39 | | vulnerable road user who is approaching from the opposite direction |
---|
40 | 40 | | and is in the intersection or in such proximity to the intersection |
---|
41 | 41 | | as to be an immediate hazard. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (e) An operator of a motor vehicle may not overtake a |
---|
43 | 43 | | vulnerable road user traveling in the same direction and |
---|
44 | 44 | | subsequently make a right-hand turn in front of the vulnerable road |
---|
45 | 45 | | user unless the operator is safely clear of the vulnerable road |
---|
46 | 46 | | user, taking into account the speed at which the vulnerable road |
---|
47 | 47 | | user is traveling and the braking requirements of the vehicle |
---|
48 | 48 | | making the right-hand turn. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (f) An operator of a motor vehicle may not maneuver the |
---|
50 | 50 | | vehicle in a manner that: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) is intended to cause intimidation or harassment to |
---|
52 | 52 | | a vulnerable road user; or |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) threatens a vulnerable road user. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (g) An operator of a motor vehicle shall exercise due care |
---|
55 | 55 | | to avoid colliding with any vulnerable road user on a roadway or in |
---|
56 | 56 | | an intersection of roadways. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (h) A violation of this section is punishable under Section |
---|
58 | 58 | | 542.401 except that: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) if the violation results in property damage, the |
---|
60 | 60 | | violation is a misdemeanor punishable by a fine of not to exceed |
---|
61 | 61 | | $500; or |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) if the violation results in bodily injury, the |
---|
63 | 63 | | violation is a Class B misdemeanor. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (i) It is a defense to prosecution under this section that |
---|
65 | 65 | | at the time of the offense the vulnerable road user was acting in |
---|
66 | 66 | | violation of the law. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (j) If conduct constituting an offense under this section |
---|
68 | 68 | | also constitutes an offense under another section of this code or |
---|
69 | 69 | | the Penal Code, the actor may be prosecuted under either section or |
---|
70 | 70 | | both sections. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
72 | 72 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
73 | 73 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
74 | 74 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 488 passed the Senate on |
---|
75 | 75 | | April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 5; |
---|
76 | 76 | | May 23, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
77 | 77 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House |
---|
78 | 78 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
79 | 79 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 26, |
---|
80 | 80 | | Nays 5. |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
83 | 83 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 488 passed the House, with |
---|
84 | 84 | | amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, |
---|
85 | 85 | | Nays 5, one present not voting; May 29, 2009, House granted request |
---|
86 | 86 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
87 | 87 | | May 30, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
88 | 88 | | following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
89 | 89 | | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
91 | 91 | | Approved: |
---|
92 | 92 | | ______________________________ |
---|
93 | 93 | | Date |
---|
94 | 94 | | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | 95 | | Governor |
---|