House | 05/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1012 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 809 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 497 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 01/15/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/15/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |