House | 05/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 720 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 720 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 720 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 01/21/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/21/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |