Senate | 04/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 269 | |
Senate | 02/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 156 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 68 | |
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |