E
|
05/23/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
E
|
05/14/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#782
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 3261
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/12/09 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 1169
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1133
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1073
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 156
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|