Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB526 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 526


 AN ACT
 relating to grants for federally qualified health centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.017, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.017. FEDERALLY QUALIFIED HEALTH CENTERS.
 [(a)] The department may make grants to establish new or expand
 existing facilities and to support new or expanded services at
 facilities that can qualify as federally qualified health centers,
 as defined by 42 U.S.C. Section 1396d(l)(2)(B), in this state,
 including:
 (1) planning grants;
 (2) development grants;
 (3) capital improvement grants; and
 (4) grants for transitional operating support.
 [(b) This section expires September 1, 2009.]
 SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. This
 Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the
 implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations
 act of the 81st Legislature.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect August 31, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 526 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 526 passed the House on
 May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor