1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 534 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the El Paso County Hospital District. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 281.021, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
8 | 8 | | amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (e) The El Paso County Commissioners Court shall appoint a |
---|
10 | 10 | | board composed of seven members. |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 2. Section 281.022, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (d) The members of the board of hospital managers of the El |
---|
14 | 14 | | Paso County Hospital District serve staggered three-year terms, |
---|
15 | 15 | | with as near as possible to one-third of the members' terms expiring |
---|
16 | 16 | | each year. |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 281, Health and Safety |
---|
18 | 18 | | Code, is amended by adding Sections 281.0221 and 281.031 to read as |
---|
19 | 19 | | follows: |
---|
20 | 20 | | Sec. 281.0221. TERM LIMIT. A member of the board of |
---|
21 | 21 | | hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District may not |
---|
22 | 22 | | serve more than two consecutive three-year terms and is not |
---|
23 | 23 | | eligible for reappointment to the board until the second |
---|
24 | 24 | | anniversary of the date the member's eligibility expires under this |
---|
25 | 25 | | section. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 281.031. REMOVAL OF BOARD MEMBER. (a) A member of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District |
---|
28 | 28 | | is considered to have resigned the member's position if the member: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) is absent from all the regularly scheduled board |
---|
30 | 30 | | and committee meetings that the member is eligible to attend during |
---|
31 | 31 | | a 90-day period; or |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) is absent from more than half of the regularly |
---|
33 | 33 | | scheduled board and committee meetings that the member is eligible |
---|
34 | 34 | | to attend during a 12-month period. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) A resignation under Subsection (a) is effective |
---|
36 | 36 | | immediately on the date the absence or refusal prescribed by |
---|
37 | 37 | | Subsection (a) occurs. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 4. (a) This section applies to the appointment of |
---|
39 | 39 | | the members of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County |
---|
40 | 40 | | Hospital District after the effective date of this Act, |
---|
41 | 41 | | notwithstanding other law. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) The members of the board appointed to succeed the |
---|
43 | 43 | | members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire |
---|
44 | 44 | | March 31, 2010, shall serve three-year terms. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) The members of the board appointed to succeed the |
---|
46 | 46 | | members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire |
---|
47 | 47 | | March 31, 2011, shall draw lots to determine which two members shall |
---|
48 | 48 | | serve a term expiring March 31, 2012, and which two members shall |
---|
49 | 49 | | serve a term expiring March 31, 2014. Successor members appointed |
---|
50 | 50 | | in 2012 and 2014 serve three-year terms. |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
52 | 52 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
54 | 54 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 534 passed the Senate on |
---|
55 | 55 | | April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | 58 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 534 passed the House on |
---|
59 | 59 | | May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one |
---|
60 | 60 | | present not voting. |
---|
61 | 61 | | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | 62 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
63 | 63 | | Approved: |
---|
64 | 64 | | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Date |
---|
66 | 66 | | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | 67 | | Governor |
---|