Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB534 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 534


 AN ACT
 relating to the El Paso County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 281.021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The El Paso County Commissioners Court shall appoint a
 board composed of seven members.
 SECTION 2. Section 281.022, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The members of the board of hospital managers of the El
 Paso County Hospital District serve staggered three-year terms,
 with as near as possible to one-third of the members' terms expiring
 each year.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 281, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 281.0221 and 281.031 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 281.0221.  TERM LIMIT. A member of the board of
 hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District may not
 serve more than two consecutive three-year terms and is not
 eligible for reappointment to the board until the second
 anniversary of the date the member's eligibility expires under this
 section.
 Sec. 281.031.  REMOVAL OF BOARD MEMBER. (a)  A member of the
 board of hospital managers of the El Paso County Hospital District
 is considered to have resigned the member's position if the member:
 (1)  is absent from all the regularly scheduled board
 and committee meetings that the member is eligible to attend during
 a 90-day period; or
 (2)  is absent from more than half of the regularly
 scheduled board and committee meetings that the member is eligible
 to attend during a 12-month period.
 (b)  A resignation under Subsection (a) is effective
 immediately on the date the absence or refusal prescribed by
 Subsection (a) occurs.
 SECTION 4. (a) This section applies to the appointment of
 the members of the board of hospital managers of the El Paso County
 Hospital District after the effective date of this Act,
 notwithstanding other law.
 (b) The members of the board appointed to succeed the
 members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire
 March 31, 2010, shall serve three-year terms.
 (c) The members of the board appointed to succeed the
 members serving on the effective date of this Act whose terms expire
 March 31, 2011, shall draw lots to determine which two members shall
 serve a term expiring March 31, 2012, and which two members shall
 serve a term expiring March 31, 2014. Successor members appointed
 in 2012 and 2014 serve three-year terms.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 534 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 534 passed the House on
 May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor