1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 537 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the emergency installation and use of a device to |
---|
6 | 6 | | intercept wire, oral, or electronic communications. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 8A, Article 18.20, Code |
---|
9 | 9 | | of Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (b) A peace officer designated under Subsection (a) or under |
---|
11 | 11 | | Section 5(b) may possess, install, operate, or monitor an |
---|
12 | 12 | | electronic, mechanical, or other device to intercept wire, oral, or |
---|
13 | 13 | | electronic communications if the officer: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) reasonably believes an immediate life-threatening |
---|
15 | 15 | | situation exists that: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (A) is within the territorial jurisdiction of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | officer or another officer the officer is assisting; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | (B) requires interception of communications |
---|
19 | 19 | | before an order authorizing the interception can, with due |
---|
20 | 20 | | diligence, be obtained under this section; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) reasonably believes there are sufficient grounds |
---|
22 | 22 | | under this section on which to obtain an order authorizing the |
---|
23 | 23 | | interception; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) obtains oral or written consent to the |
---|
25 | 25 | | interception before beginning the interception from: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (A) a judge of competent jurisdiction; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (B) a district judge for the county in which the |
---|
28 | 28 | | device will be installed or used; or |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) [(B)] a judge or justice of a court of |
---|
30 | 30 | | appeals or of a higher court. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Subsection |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b), Section 8A, Article 18.20, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies |
---|
33 | 33 | | only to the interception of a wire, oral, or electronic |
---|
34 | 34 | | communication in an immediate life-threatening situation that |
---|
35 | 35 | | occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. An interception |
---|
36 | 36 | | of a wire, oral, or electronic communication in an immediate |
---|
37 | 37 | | life-threatening situation that occurred before the effective date |
---|
38 | 38 | | of this Act is covered by the law in effect on the date the |
---|
39 | 39 | | life-threatening situation occurred, and the former law is |
---|
40 | 40 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
42 | 42 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | 43 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | 44 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the Senate on |
---|
45 | 45 | | April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
46 | 46 | | May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
47 | 47 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
48 | 48 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
49 | 49 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
50 | 50 | | Nays 0. |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | 53 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the House, with |
---|
54 | 54 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
55 | 55 | | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
56 | 56 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
57 | 57 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
58 | 58 | | following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
59 | 59 | | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | 60 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | 61 | | Approved: |
---|
62 | 62 | | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Date |
---|
64 | 64 | | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Governor |
---|