Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB537 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 537


 AN ACT
 relating to the emergency installation and use of a device to
 intercept wire, oral, or electronic communications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 8A, Article 18.20, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) A peace officer designated under Subsection (a) or under
 Section 5(b) may possess, install, operate, or monitor an
 electronic, mechanical, or other device to intercept wire, oral, or
 electronic communications if the officer:
 (1) reasonably believes an immediate life-threatening
 situation exists that:
 (A) is within the territorial jurisdiction of the
 officer or another officer the officer is assisting; and
 (B) requires interception of communications
 before an order authorizing the interception can, with due
 diligence, be obtained under this section;
 (2) reasonably believes there are sufficient grounds
 under this section on which to obtain an order authorizing the
 interception; and
 (3) obtains oral or written consent to the
 interception before beginning the interception from:
 (A) a judge of competent jurisdiction;
 (B) a district judge for the county in which the
 device will be installed or used; or
 (C) [(B)] a judge or justice of a court of
 appeals or of a higher court.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (b), Section 8A, Article 18.20, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies
 only to the interception of a wire, oral, or electronic
 communication in an immediate life-threatening situation that
 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. An interception
 of a wire, oral, or electronic communication in an immediate
 life-threatening situation that occurred before the effective date
 of this Act is covered by the law in effect on the date the
 life-threatening situation occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 537 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor