House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1169 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 899 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |