Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB54 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 54
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 6, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 54 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the supervision of certain juvenile case managers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 45.056, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The judge of a court that employs a juvenile case
 manager under Subsection (a) or (c) shall supervise the juvenile
 case manager, except that the judge may delegate that duty to
 another officer of the court who is authorized to conduct hearings
 under Title 3, Family Code. The judge may not delegate that duty to
 the clerk of the court.  This subsection does not apply to a county
 court for which the county judge has appointed one or more full-time
 magistrates under Section 54.1172, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (f), Article 45.056, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as added by this Act, applies to the supervision of a
 juvenile case manager employed by a court on or after the effective
 date of this Act, regardless of whether the juvenile case manager
 began that employment before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *