Senate | 05/21/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 140 | |
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 58 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |