Senate | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 300 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 300 | |
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |