E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1198
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 580
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
Senate
|
01/29/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|