Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 01/30/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |