Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB605 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Deuell, et al. S.B. No. 605
22 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2009; February 23, 2009,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
44 March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 26, 2009,
66 sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 605 By: Deuell
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to incentives for the film, television, video, and digital
1313 interactive media production industries.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Subdivisions (2) and (5), Section 485.021,
1616 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
1717 (2) "Moving image project" means a visual and sound
1818 production, including a film, television program, national or
1919 multistate commercial, educational or instructional video, or
2020 digital interactive media production. The term does not include a
2121 production that is obscene, as defined by Section 43.21, Penal
2222 Code.
2323 (5) "Underutilized and economically distressed
2424 ["Underused] area" includes any area of this state that:
2525 (A) the office determines receives less than 15
2626 percent of the total film and television production in this state
2727 during a fiscal year; or
2828 (B) has a median household income that does not
2929 exceed 75 percent of the median state household income [other than
3030 the metropolitan areas of Austin or Dallas].
3131 SECTION 2. Section 485.023, Government Code, is amended to
3232 read as follows:
3333 Sec. 485.023. QUALIFICATION. To qualify for a grant under
3434 this subchapter:
3535 (1) a production company must have spent a minimum of:
3636 (A) $250,000 [$1 million] in in-state spending
3737 for a film or television program; or
3838 (B) $100,000 in in-state spending for a
3939 commercial or series of commercials, an educational or
4040 instructional video or series of educational or instructional
4141 videos, or a digital interactive media production;
4242 (2) at least 70 percent of the production crew,
4343 actors, and extras for a moving image project must be Texas
4444 residents unless the office determines and certifies in writing
4545 that a sufficient number of qualified crew, actors, and extras are
4646 not available to the company at the time principal photography
4747 begins;
4848 (3) at least 60 [80] percent of the moving image
4949 project must be filmed in Texas; and
5050 (4) a production company must submit to the office an
5151 expended budget, in a format prescribed by the office, that
5252 reflects all in-state spending and includes all receipts, invoices,
5353 pay orders, and other documentation considered necessary by the
5454 office to accurately determine the amount of a production company's
5555 in-state spending that has occurred.
5656 SECTION 3. Sections 485.024 and 485.025, Government Code,
5757 are amended to read as follows:
5858 Sec. 485.024. GRANT. (a) Except as provided by Section
5959 485.025, a grant under this subchapter may not exceed the amount
6060 established by office rule. The office shall adopt rules
6161 prescribing the method the office will use to calculate the amount
6262 of a grant under this subsection. The office shall publish a
6363 written summary of the method for determining grants before
6464 awarding a grant under this section. The method must consider at a
6565 minimum:
6666 (1) the current and likely future effect a moving
6767 image project will have on employment, tourism, and economic
6868 activity in this state; and
6969 (2) the amount of a production company's in-state
7070 spending for a moving image project [lesser of five percent of the
7171 total amount of a production company's in-state spending for a
7272 moving image project or:
7373 [(1) $2 million for a film;
7474 [(2) $2.5 million for a television program;
7575 [(3) $200,000 for a commercial or series of
7676 commercials; or
7777 [(4) $250,000 for a digital interactive media
7878 production].
7979 (b) In calculating a grant amount under Section 485.025 or
8080 the amount of in-state spending for purposes of rules adopted under
8181 Subsection (a), the office may not include wages of persons,
8282 including an actor or director, employed in the production of a
8383 moving image project that exceed $1 million [are:
8484 [(1) a major part of the production costs of the
8585 project, as determined by the office; and
8686 [(2) negotiated or spent before production begins].
8787 (c) The office may only make a grant from appropriated
8888 funds.
8989 Sec. 485.025. ADDITIONAL GRANT FOR UNDERUTILIZED AND
9090 ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED [UNDERUSED] AREAS. In addition to the
9191 grant calculated under Section 485.024, a production company that
9292 spends at least 25 percent of a moving image project's filming days
9393 in an underutilized and economically distressed [underused] area is
9494 eligible for an additional grant in an amount equal to 2.5 [1.25]
9595 percent of the total amount of the production company's in-state
9696 spending for the moving image project.
9797 SECTION 4. (a) The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia
9898 Office in the office of the governor shall adopt the rules required
9999 by Section 485.024, Government Code, as amended by this Act, not
100100 later than November 1, 2009.
101101 (b) The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia Office in
102102 the office of the governor may not award a grant under Section
103103 485.024, Government Code, as amended by this Act, before the rules
104104 described by Subsection (a) of this section are adopted.
105105 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
106106 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
107107 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
108108 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
109109 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
110110 * * * * *