Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB605 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell, et al. S.B. No. 605
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 26, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 605 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to incentives for the film, television, video, and digital
 interactive media production industries.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivisions (2) and (5), Section 485.021,
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (2) "Moving image project" means a visual and sound
 production, including a film, television program, national or
 multistate commercial, educational or instructional video, or
 digital interactive media production. The term does not include a
 production that is obscene, as defined by Section 43.21, Penal
 Code.
 (5) "Underutilized and economically distressed
 ["Underused] area" includes any area of this state that:
 (A)  the office determines receives less than 15
 percent of the total film and television production in this state
 during a fiscal year; or
 (B)  has a median household income that does not
 exceed 75 percent of the median state household income [other than
 the metropolitan areas of Austin or Dallas].
 SECTION 2. Section 485.023, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 485.023. QUALIFICATION. To qualify for a grant under
 this subchapter:
 (1) a production company must have spent a minimum of:
 (A) $250,000 [$1 million] in in-state spending
 for a film or television program; or
 (B) $100,000 in in-state spending for a
 commercial or series of commercials, an educational or
 instructional video or series of educational or instructional
 videos, or a digital interactive media production;
 (2) at least 70 percent of the production crew,
 actors, and extras for a moving image project must be Texas
 residents unless the office determines and certifies in writing
 that a sufficient number of qualified crew, actors, and extras are
 not available to the company at the time principal photography
 begins;
 (3) at least 60 [80] percent of the moving image
 project must be filmed in Texas; and
 (4) a production company must submit to the office an
 expended budget, in a format prescribed by the office, that
 reflects all in-state spending and includes all receipts, invoices,
 pay orders, and other documentation considered necessary by the
 office to accurately determine the amount of a production company's
 in-state spending that has occurred.
 SECTION 3. Sections 485.024 and 485.025, Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 485.024. GRANT. (a) Except as provided by Section
 485.025, a grant under this subchapter may not exceed the amount
 established by office rule.  The office shall adopt rules
 prescribing the method the office will use to calculate the amount
 of a grant under this subsection.  The office shall publish a
 written summary of the method for determining grants before
 awarding a grant under this section.  The method must consider at a
 minimum:
 (1)  the current and likely future effect a moving
 image project will have on employment, tourism, and economic
 activity in this state; and
 (2)  the amount of a production company's in-state
 spending for a moving image project [lesser of five percent of the
 total amount of a production company's in-state spending for a
 moving image project or:
 [(1) $2 million for a film;
 [(2) $2.5 million for a television program;
 [(3)     $200,000 for a commercial or series of
 commercials; or
 [(4)     $250,000 for a digital interactive media
 production].
 (b) In calculating a grant amount under Section 485.025 or
 the amount of in-state spending for purposes of rules adopted under
 Subsection (a), the office may not include wages of persons,
 including an actor or director, employed in the production of a
 moving image project that exceed $1 million [are:
 [(1)     a major part of the production costs of the
 project, as determined by the office; and
 [(2) negotiated or spent before production begins].
 (c)  The office may only make a grant from appropriated
 funds.
 Sec. 485.025. ADDITIONAL GRANT FOR UNDERUTILIZED AND
 ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED [UNDERUSED] AREAS. In addition to the
 grant calculated under Section 485.024, a production company that
 spends at least 25 percent of a moving image project's filming days
 in an underutilized and economically distressed [underused] area is
 eligible for an additional grant in an amount equal to 2.5 [1.25]
 percent of the total amount of the production company's in-state
 spending for the moving image project.
 SECTION 4. (a) The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia
 Office in the office of the governor shall adopt the rules required
 by Section 485.024, Government Code, as amended by this Act, not
 later than November 1, 2009.
 (b) The Music, Film, Television, and Multimedia Office in
 the office of the governor may not award a grant under Section
 485.024, Government Code, as amended by this Act, before the rules
 described by Subsection (a) of this section are adopted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *