House | 05/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2131 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1355 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |