E | 05/23/2009 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/15/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2442 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3716 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2400 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3310 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#788 | Journal Page: 3310 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3310 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3310 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3289 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3289 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1967 | Journal Page: 3289 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1151 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1151 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1151 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1150 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1150 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1150 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1150 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1150 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1150 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1149 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |