Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB670 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R2259 BEF-D
 By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 670


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to design and construction standards for newly constructed
 state buildings, public school facilities, and higher education
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 2166, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2166.409 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2166.409.  HIGH-PERFORMANCE, SUSTAINABLE DESIGN AND
 CONSTRUCTION SPECIFICATIONS FOR NEW STATE BUILDING.  (a)  This
 section applies to the construction of a state building, including
 a building construction project otherwise exempt from this chapter
 under Section 2166.003, except that this section does not apply to a
 project constructed by and for an institution of higher education
 as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  A building to which this section applies must be
 designed and constructed so that the building may be certified
 under the United States Green Building Council's Leadership in
 Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) rating system as that
 standard exists as of September 1, 2009.
 (c)  The commission shall adopt rules for the administration
 of this section. The rules may establish an exception to the
 application of this section for a type of building if the commission
 determines that:
 (1)  the standards described by Subsection (b) do not
 apply to that type of building; or
 (2)  there is no practical way to apply the standards
 described by Subsection (b) to the design and construction of that
 type of building.
 (d) The commission shall:
 (1) monitor and document:
 (A)  each state agency's compliance with this
 section; and
 (B)  any operating savings resulting from the
 design and construction of buildings in accordance with this
 section; and
 (2)  not later than September 1 of each even-numbered
 year, submit to the legislature and governor a report regarding:
 (A)  the commission's findings under Subdivision
 (1);
 (B)  any instances in which, and the reasons for
 which, a state building was not designed and constructed in the
 manner provided by Subsection (b); and
 (C)  any recommendations the commission considers
 appropriate.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 44, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 44.904 to read as follows:
 Sec. 44.904.  HIGH-PERFORMANCE, SUSTAINABLE DESIGN AND
 CONSTRUCTION SPECIFICATIONS FOR CERTAIN NEWLY CONSTRUCTED
 FACILITIES.  (a)  In this section, "instructional facility" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 46.001.
 (b)  This section applies to a newly constructed
 instructional facility of a school district.
 (c)  A facility to which this section applies must be
 designed and constructed so that the facility may be certified
 under the United States Green Building Council's Leadership in
 Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) rating system as that
 standard exists as of September 1, 2009.
 (d)  The agency shall adopt rules for the administration of
 this section. The rules may establish an exception to the
 application of this section for a type of facility if the agency
 determines that:
 (1)  the standards described by Subsection (c) do not
 apply to that type of facility; or
 (2)  there is no practical way to apply the standards
 described by Subsection (c) to the design and construction of that
 type of facility.
 (e) The agency shall:
 (1) monitor and document:
 (A)  each district's compliance with this
 section; and
 (B)  any operating savings resulting from the
 design and construction of facilities in accordance with this
 section; and
 (2)  not later than September 1 of each even-numbered
 year, submit to the legislature and governor a report regarding:
 (A) the agency's findings under Subdivision (1);
 (B)  any instances in which, and the reasons for
 which, a facility was not designed and constructed in the manner
 provided by Subsection (c); and
 (C)  any recommendations the agency considers
 appropriate.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0584 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0584.  HIGH-PERFORMANCE, SUSTAINABLE DESIGN AND
 CONSTRUCTION SPECIFICATIONS FOR CERTAIN NEWLY CONSTRUCTED
 FACILITIES.  (a)  This section applies to a newly constructed
 facility of an institution of higher education.
 (b)  A facility to which this section applies must be
 designed and constructed so that the facility may be certified
 under the United States Green Building Council's Leadership in
 Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) rating system as that
 standard exists as of September 1, 2009.
 (c)  The board shall adopt rules for the administration of
 this section. The rules may establish an exception to the
 application of this section for a type of facility if the board
 determines that:
 (1)  the standards described by Subsection (b) do not
 apply to that type of facility; or
 (2)  there is no practical way to apply the standards
 described by Subsection (b) to the design and construction of that
 type of facility.
 (d) The board shall:
 (1) monitor and document:
 (A)  each institution's compliance with this
 section; and
 (B)  any operating savings resulting from the
 design and construction of facilities in accordance with this
 section; and
 (2)  not later than September 1 of each even-numbered
 year, submit to the legislature and governor a report regarding:
 (A) the board's findings under Subdivision (1);
 (B)  any instances in which, and the reasons for
 which, a facility was not designed and constructed in the manner
 provided by Subsection (b); and
 (C)  any recommendations the board considers
 appropriate.
 SECTION 4. (a) The Texas Facilities Commission shall
 establish and appoint members to an advisory committee to make
 recommendations to and advise the commission on the implementation
 of the design and construction specifications required by this Act.
 The advisory committee must include representatives of:
 (1) the design and construction industry involved in
 public building contracts;
 (2) the Texas Education Agency;
 (3) the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board;
 (4) institutions of higher education; and
 (5) public school districts.
 (b) This section expires and the advisory committee is
 abolished September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 5. (a) The state auditor shall prepare a report
 concerning the implementation of the design and construction
 specifications required by this Act and shall present the report to
 the 83rd Legislature not later than January 15, 2013. The report
 must include:
 (1) the costs of implementing the specifications;
 (2) the operating savings attributable to
 implementing the specifications, including energy and maintenance
 savings;
 (3) any impact on employee productivity and student
 performance resulting from implementing the specifications;
 (4) the effectiveness of the implementation of the
 specifications; and
 (5) any recommendations the state auditor considers
 appropriate.
 (b) This section expires January 16, 2013.
 SECTION 6. Sections 44.904 and 61.0584, Education Code, and
 Section 2166.409, Government Code, as added by this Act, apply only
 to the construction of a facility or building for which the contract
 for design services is entered into on or after September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.