Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB686 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis, et al. S.B. No. 686
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2009; February 23, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 686 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the installation, maintenance, or operation of natural
 gas pipelines on state highways and highway rights-of-way.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 203, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 203.096 to read as follows:
 Sec. 203.096.  NATURAL GAS PIPELINE IN RIGHT-OF-WAY.
 (a)  In this section, "gas utility" means:
 (1)  a gas utility as defined by Section 121.001 or
 181.021, Utilities Code; or
 (2) a person that:
 (A)  is a common carrier under Section 111.002,
 Natural Resources Code;
 (B)  is a common purchaser under Section 111.081,
 Natural Resources Code; or
 (C)  owns, manages, operates, leases, or controls
 a gas pipeline facility that is subject to Section 121.201,
 Utilities Code.
 (b)  This section applies only to a natural gas pipeline
 located or proposed to be located in:
 (1)  a county in which a part of the Barnett Shale
 natural gas field is known to be located;
 (2)  a county that is located in the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization; or
 (3) the corporate limits of a municipality.
 (c)  A gas utility is entitled to lay, maintain, and operate
 a natural gas pipeline through, under, along, or across a state
 highway, including a controlled access highway, only if:
 (1)  the pipeline is subject to the jurisdiction,
 control, and regulation of the Railroad Commission of Texas and
 subject to safety standard requirements pertaining to gas pipeline
 facilities and transmission lines for the transportation of gas;
 (2)  the pipeline complies with all applicable state
 rules and federal regulations on the accommodation of utility
 facilities on the highway or right-of-way, including rules and
 regulations relating to the horizontal and vertical location of the
 pipeline; and
 (3)  the highway and associated facilities are promptly
 restored to their former condition of usefulness after the
 installation or maintenance of the pipeline, as applicable, is
 complete.
 (d)  Subject to Section 203.092, the commission may require a
 gas utility to relocate a facility at the cost of the gas utility to
 accommodate construction or expansion of the highway or for any
 other public work unless the gas utility has a property interest in
 the land occupied by the facility to be relocated.
 (e)  This section may not be construed to limit the authority
 of a gas utility to use a public right-of-way.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *