1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 686 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the installation, maintenance, or operation of natural |
---|
6 | 6 | | gas pipelines on state highways and highway and county road |
---|
7 | 7 | | rights-of-way. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 203, Transportation Code, |
---|
10 | 10 | | is amended by adding Section 203.096 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 203.096. NATURAL GAS PIPELINE IN RIGHT-OF-WAY. |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) In this section, "gas utility" means: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) a gas utility as defined by Section 121.001 or |
---|
14 | 14 | | 181.021, Utilities Code; or |
---|
15 | 15 | | (2) a person that: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (A) is a common carrier under Section 111.002, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Natural Resources Code; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (B) is a common purchaser under Section 111.081, |
---|
19 | 19 | | Natural Resources Code; or |
---|
20 | 20 | | (C) owns, manages, operates, leases, or controls |
---|
21 | 21 | | a gas pipeline facility that is subject to Section 121.201, |
---|
22 | 22 | | Utilities Code. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) This section applies only to a natural gas pipeline |
---|
24 | 24 | | located or proposed to be located in: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) a county in which a part of the Barnett Shale |
---|
26 | 26 | | natural gas field is known to be located; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) a county that is located in the boundaries of a |
---|
28 | 28 | | metropolitan planning organization; or |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) the corporate limits of a municipality. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) A gas utility is entitled to lay, maintain, and operate |
---|
31 | 31 | | a natural gas pipeline through, under, along, or across a |
---|
32 | 32 | | controlled access highway, as defined by Section 203.001(1), only |
---|
33 | 33 | | if: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) the pipeline is subject to the jurisdiction, |
---|
35 | 35 | | control, and regulation of the Railroad Commission of Texas and |
---|
36 | 36 | | subject to safety standard requirements pertaining to gas pipeline |
---|
37 | 37 | | facilities and transmission lines for the transportation of gas; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) the pipeline complies with all applicable state |
---|
39 | 39 | | rules consistent with this section and all applicable federal |
---|
40 | 40 | | regulations on the accommodation of utility facilities on the |
---|
41 | 41 | | highway or right-of-way, including rules and regulations relating |
---|
42 | 42 | | to the horizontal and vertical location of the pipeline; and |
---|
43 | 43 | | (3) the highway and associated facilities are promptly |
---|
44 | 44 | | restored to their former condition of usefulness after the |
---|
45 | 45 | | installation or maintenance of the pipeline, as applicable, is |
---|
46 | 46 | | complete. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (d) Subject to Section 203.092, the department may require a |
---|
48 | 48 | | gas utility to relocate a facility at the cost of the gas utility to |
---|
49 | 49 | | accommodate construction or expansion of the highway or for any |
---|
50 | 50 | | other public work unless the gas utility has a property interest in |
---|
51 | 51 | | the land occupied by the facility to be relocated. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (e) This section may not be construed to: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) limit the authority of a gas utility to use a |
---|
54 | 54 | | public right-of-way under any other law; or |
---|
55 | 55 | | (2) affect the authority of a municipality to: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (A) regulate the use of a public right-of-way by |
---|
57 | 57 | | a gas utility under any other law; or |
---|
58 | 58 | | (B) require payment of any applicable charge |
---|
59 | 59 | | under Section 121.2025, Utilities Code, and Sections 182.025 and |
---|
60 | 60 | | 182.026, Tax Code. |
---|
61 | 61 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 251, Transportation Code, |
---|
62 | 62 | | is amended by adding Section 251.018 to read as follows: |
---|
63 | 63 | | Sec. 251.018. SUBSURFACE ACCESS IN RIGHT-OF-WAY. (a) A |
---|
64 | 64 | | county shall allow subsurface access to a county road right-of-way |
---|
65 | 65 | | for the installation of a temporary water line that does not |
---|
66 | 66 | | interfere with existing utilities located in the right-of-way. The |
---|
67 | 67 | | county may regulate the horizontal or vertical location of the |
---|
68 | 68 | | water line within the right-of-way. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (b) A county may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or |
---|
70 | 70 | | regulation that establishes or conflicts with a safety standard or |
---|
71 | 71 | | practice applicable to a temporary water line that is regulated |
---|
72 | 72 | | under state or federal law. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
74 | 74 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
75 | 75 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
76 | 76 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
77 | 77 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
78 | 78 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
79 | 79 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
80 | 80 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 686 passed the Senate on |
---|
81 | 81 | | April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
82 | 82 | | May 23, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
83 | 83 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2009, House |
---|
84 | 84 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
85 | 85 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
86 | 86 | | Nays 0. |
---|
87 | 87 | | ______________________________ |
---|
88 | 88 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
89 | 89 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 686 passed the House, with |
---|
90 | 90 | | amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, |
---|
91 | 91 | | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 28, 2009, House granted request |
---|
92 | 92 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
93 | 93 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
94 | 94 | | following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
95 | 95 | | ______________________________ |
---|
96 | 96 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
97 | 97 | | Approved: |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Date |
---|
100 | 100 | | ______________________________ |
---|
101 | 101 | | Governor |
---|