Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB686 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 686


 AN ACT
 relating to the installation, maintenance, or operation of natural
 gas pipelines on state highways and highway and county road
 rights-of-way.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 203, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 203.096 to read as follows:
 Sec. 203.096.  NATURAL GAS PIPELINE IN RIGHT-OF-WAY.
 (a)  In this section, "gas utility" means:
 (1)  a gas utility as defined by Section 121.001 or
 181.021, Utilities Code; or
 (2) a person that:
 (A)  is a common carrier under Section 111.002,
 Natural Resources Code;
 (B)  is a common purchaser under Section 111.081,
 Natural Resources Code; or
 (C)  owns, manages, operates, leases, or controls
 a gas pipeline facility that is subject to Section 121.201,
 Utilities Code.
 (b)  This section applies only to a natural gas pipeline
 located or proposed to be located in:
 (1)  a county in which a part of the Barnett Shale
 natural gas field is known to be located;
 (2)  a county that is located in the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization; or
 (3) the corporate limits of a municipality.
 (c)  A gas utility is entitled to lay, maintain, and operate
 a natural gas pipeline through, under, along, or across a
 controlled access highway, as defined by Section 203.001(1), only
 if:
 (1)  the pipeline is subject to the jurisdiction,
 control, and regulation of the Railroad Commission of Texas and
 subject to safety standard requirements pertaining to gas pipeline
 facilities and transmission lines for the transportation of gas;
 (2)  the pipeline complies with all applicable state
 rules consistent with this section and all applicable federal
 regulations on the accommodation of utility facilities on the
 highway or right-of-way, including rules and regulations relating
 to the horizontal and vertical location of the pipeline; and
 (3)  the highway and associated facilities are promptly
 restored to their former condition of usefulness after the
 installation or maintenance of the pipeline, as applicable, is
 complete.
 (d)  Subject to Section 203.092, the department may require a
 gas utility to relocate a facility at the cost of the gas utility to
 accommodate construction or expansion of the highway or for any
 other public work unless the gas utility has a property interest in
 the land occupied by the facility to be relocated.
 (e) This section may not be construed to:
 (1)  limit the authority of a gas utility to use a
 public right-of-way under any other law; or
 (2) affect the authority of a municipality to:
 (A)  regulate the use of a public right-of-way by
 a gas utility under any other law; or
 (B)  require payment of any applicable charge
 under Section 121.2025, Utilities Code, and Sections 182.025 and
 182.026, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 251, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 251.018 to read as follows:
 Sec. 251.018.  SUBSURFACE ACCESS IN RIGHT-OF-WAY. (a)  A
 county shall allow subsurface access to a county road right-of-way
 for the installation of a temporary water line that does not
 interfere with existing utilities located in the right-of-way. The
 county may regulate the horizontal or vertical location of the
 water line within the right-of-way.
 (b)  A county may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or
 regulation that establishes or conflicts with a safety standard or
 practice applicable to a temporary water line that is regulated
 under state or federal law.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 686 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 686 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 28, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor