1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 698 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of a registry at the Texas Department |
---|
6 | 6 | | of Insurance of certain legal entities alleged to have sold |
---|
7 | 7 | | race-based insurance coverage. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 521, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 10 | | adding Subchapter D to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SUBCHAPTER D. RACE-BASED INSURANCE REGISTRY |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 521.151. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
13 | 13 | | applies to any legal entity engaged in the business of insurance in |
---|
14 | 14 | | this state, including: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) a capital stock insurance company; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) a mutual insurance company; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (3) a title insurance company; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (4) a fraternal benefit society; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (5) a local mutual aid association; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (6) a statewide mutual assessment company; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (7) a county mutual insurance company; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (8) a Lloyd's plan; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (9) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (10) a stipulated premium company; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (11) a group hospital service corporation; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (12) a farm mutual insurance company; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (13) a risk retention group; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (14) an eligible surplus lines insurer; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (15) an agent, broker, adjuster, or life and health |
---|
30 | 30 | | insurance counselor. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Sec. 521.152. REGISTRY; INTERNET POSTING. (a) The |
---|
32 | 32 | | commissioner shall establish a registry of each legal entity |
---|
33 | 33 | | engaged in the business of insurance in this state that, formally or |
---|
34 | 34 | | informally, has entered into an agreement with the department: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) that disposes of allegations of race-based |
---|
36 | 36 | | pricing; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) under which all or part of the relief agreed on to |
---|
38 | 38 | | make insureds whole includes a claims-made offer that remains in |
---|
39 | 39 | | place and has not otherwise expired under the terms of the |
---|
40 | 40 | | agreement. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) The registry must be prominently published on the |
---|
42 | 42 | | department's Internet website, and must: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) identify: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (A) each insurance company that has entered into |
---|
45 | 45 | | an agreement described by Subsection (a); and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (B) the eligibility and terms of the insurance |
---|
47 | 47 | | company's claims-made offer; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) include: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (A) a claim form; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (B) links to the Internet website of the |
---|
51 | 51 | | insurance company that is administrating the claims-made offer. |
---|
52 | 52 | | Sec. 521.153. PRESERVATION OF CERTAIN RECORDS REGARDING |
---|
53 | 53 | | RACE-BASED PRICING. (a) Notwithstanding Chapter 441, Government |
---|
54 | 54 | | Code, the department shall preserve all examinations, exhibits to |
---|
55 | 55 | | examinations, and other relevant documents regarding race-based |
---|
56 | 56 | | pricing that the department has gathered or created with respect to |
---|
57 | 57 | | a race-based pricing investigation that is completed or ongoing on |
---|
58 | 58 | | September 1, 2009, other than those for which an attorney-client or |
---|
59 | 59 | | attorney work product privilege can be claimed, until the time that |
---|
60 | 60 | | those documents are eligible for delivery under Subsection (b). |
---|
61 | 61 | | (b) On the completion of the department's race-based |
---|
62 | 62 | | pricing investigation, but not later than January 15, 2011, the |
---|
63 | 63 | | department shall deliver the records identified under Subsection |
---|
64 | 64 | | (a) or copies of those records to the state archivist. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (c) The state archives shall: |
---|
66 | 66 | | (1) using best efforts, preserve and catalogue the |
---|
67 | 67 | | records identified under Subsection (a); and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) make the records available to the public as soon as |
---|
69 | 69 | | appropriate, but not later than January 15, 2015. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 2. The commissioner of insurance shall establish |
---|
71 | 71 | | the registry as required by Subchapter D, Chapter 521, Insurance |
---|
72 | 72 | | Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
76 | 76 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 698 passed the Senate on |
---|
77 | 77 | | April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
78 | 78 | | the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the |
---|
79 | 79 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
80 | 80 | | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | 81 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
82 | 82 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 698 passed the House, with |
---|
83 | 83 | | amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, |
---|
84 | 84 | | Nays 8, one present not voting. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
87 | 87 | | Approved: |
---|
88 | 88 | | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | 89 | | Date |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | Governor |
---|