Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB698 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 698


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a registry at the Texas Department
 of Insurance of certain legal entities alleged to have sold
 race-based insurance coverage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 521, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. RACE-BASED INSURANCE REGISTRY
 Sec. 521.151.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 applies to any legal entity engaged in the business of insurance in
 this state, including:
 (1) a capital stock insurance company;
 (2) a mutual insurance company;
 (3) a title insurance company;
 (4) a fraternal benefit society;
 (5) a local mutual aid association;
 (6) a statewide mutual assessment company;
 (7) a county mutual insurance company;
 (8) a Lloyd's plan;
 (9) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
 (10) a stipulated premium company;
 (11) a group hospital service corporation;
 (12) a farm mutual insurance company;
 (13) a risk retention group;
 (14) an eligible surplus lines insurer; and
 (15)  an agent, broker, adjuster, or life and health
 insurance counselor.
 Sec. 521.152.  REGISTRY; INTERNET POSTING. (a) The
 commissioner shall establish a registry of each legal entity
 engaged in the business of insurance in this state that, formally or
 informally, has entered into an agreement with the department:
 (1)  that disposes of allegations of race-based
 pricing; and
 (2)  under which all or part of the relief agreed on to
 make insureds whole includes a claims-made offer that remains in
 place and has not otherwise expired under the terms of the
 agreement.
 (b)  The registry must be prominently published on the
 department's Internet website, and must:
 (1) identify:
 (A)  each insurance company that has entered into
 an agreement described by Subsection (a); and
 (B)  the eligibility and terms of the insurance
 company's claims-made offer; and
 (2) include:
 (A) a claim form; and
 (B)  links to the Internet website of the
 insurance company that is administrating the claims-made offer.
 Sec. 521.153.  PRESERVATION OF CERTAIN RECORDS REGARDING
 RACE-BASED PRICING. (a)  Notwithstanding Chapter 441, Government
 Code, the department shall preserve all examinations, exhibits to
 examinations, and other relevant documents regarding race-based
 pricing that the department has gathered or created with respect to
 a race-based pricing investigation that is completed or ongoing on
 September 1, 2009, other than those for which an attorney-client or
 attorney work product privilege can be claimed, until the time that
 those documents are eligible for delivery under Subsection (b).
 (b)  On the completion of the department's race-based
 pricing investigation, but not later than January 15, 2011, the
 department shall deliver the records identified under Subsection
 (a) or copies of those records to the state archivist.
 (c) The state archives shall:
 (1)  using best efforts, preserve and catalogue the
 records identified under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  make the records available to the public as soon as
 appropriate, but not later than January 15, 2015.
 SECTION 2. The commissioner of insurance shall establish
 the registry as required by Subchapter D, Chapter 521, Insurance
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 698 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 698 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 8, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor