Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB705 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 705
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to long-term care consumer information and Medicaid waiver
66 programs.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
99 is amended by adding Section 161.077 to read as follows:
1010 Sec. 161.077. LONG-TERM CARE MEDICAID WAIVER PROGRAMS.
1111 (a) In this section, "Section 1915(c) waiver program" has the
1212 meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
1313 (b) The department, in consultation with the commission,
1414 shall streamline the administration of and delivery of services
1515 through Section 1915(c) waiver programs. In implementing this
1616 subsection, the department, subject to Subsection (c), may consider
1717 implementing the following streamlining initiatives:
1818 (1) reducing the number of forms used in administering
1919 the programs;
2020 (2) revising program provider manuals and training
2121 curricula;
2222 (3) consolidating service authorization systems;
2323 (4) eliminating any physician signature requirements
2424 the department considers unnecessary;
2525 (5) standardizing individual service plan processes
2626 across the programs; and
2727 (6) any other initiatives that will increase
2828 efficiencies in the programs.
2929 (c) The department shall ensure that actions taken under
3030 this section do not conflict with any requirements of the
3131 commission under Section 531.0218, Government Code.
3232 SECTION 2. Effective September 15, 2009, Section 531.02191,
3333 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
3434 Sec. 531.02191. PUBLIC INPUT. In complying with the
3535 requirements of Section [Sections] 531.0218 [and 531.0219], the
3636 commission shall regularly consult with and obtain input from:
3737 (1) consumers and family members;
3838 (2) providers;
3939 (3) advocacy groups;
4040 (4) state agencies that administer a Section 1915(c)
4141 waiver program; and
4242 (5) other interested persons.
4343 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
4444 amended by adding Section 531.0318 to read as follows:
4545 Sec. 531.0318. LONG-TERM CARE CONSUMER INFORMATION MADE
4646 AVAILABLE THROUGH THE INTERNET. (a) The Internet site maintained
4747 under Section 531.0317 must include information for consumers
4848 concerning long-term care services that complies with this section.
4949 The Internet site maintained by the Department of Aging and
5050 Disability Services must also include, or provide a link to, the
5151 information required by this section.
5252 (b) The information for consumers required by this section
5353 must:
5454 (1) be presented in a manner that is easily accessible
5555 to, and understandable by, a consumer; and
5656 (2) allow a consumer to make informed choices
5757 concerning long-term care services and include:
5858 (A) an explanation of the manner in which
5959 long-term care service delivery is administered in different
6060 counties through different programs operated by the commission and
6161 by the Department of Aging and Disability Services, so that an
6262 individual can easily understand the service options available in
6363 the area in which that individual lives; and
6464 (B) for the Medicaid Star + Plus pilot program,
6565 information that allows a consumer to evaluate the performance of
6666 each participating plan issuer, including for each issuer, in an
6767 accessible format such as a table:
6868 (i) the enrollment in each county;
6969 (ii) additional "value-added" services
7070 provided;
7171 (iii) a summary of the financial
7272 statistical report required under Subchapter A, Chapter 533;
7373 (iv) complaint information;
7474 (v) any sanction or penalty imposed by any
7575 state agency, including a sanction or penalty imposed by the
7676 commission or the Texas Department of Insurance;
7777 (vi) information concerning consumer
7878 satisfaction; and
7979 (vii) other data, including relevant data
8080 from reports of external quality review organizations, that may be
8181 used by the consumer to evaluate the quality of the services
8282 provided.
8383 (c) In addition to providing the information required by
8484 this section through the Internet, the commission or the Department
8585 of Aging and Disability Services shall, on request by a consumer
8686 without Internet access, provide the consumer with a printed copy
8787 of the information from the website. The commission or department
8888 may charge a reasonable fee for printing the information.
8989 SECTION 4. (a) Effective September 15, 2009, Section
9090 531.0219, Government Code, is repealed.
9191 (b) Subject to Section 7 of this Act:
9292 (1) effective September 15, 2009, the consolidated
9393 waiver program under Section 531.0219, Government Code, is
9494 abolished; and
9595 (2) the Department of Aging and Disability Services,
9696 with the assistance of the Health and Human Services Commission,
9797 shall:
9898 (A) before September 14, 2009, determine in which
9999 other Section 1915(c) waiver programs, as defined by Section
100100 531.001, Government Code, each person receiving services through
101101 the consolidated waiver program is eligible for enrollment; and
102102 (B) not later than September 14, 2009, transfer
103103 the person's enrollment without any break in service from the
104104 consolidated waiver program to an appropriate program described by
105105 Paragraph (A) of this subdivision for which the person is eligible.
106106 (c) A person described by Subsection (b) of this section may
107107 not be placed on an interest list or any other waiting list for a
108108 Section 1915(c) waiver program instead of being enrolled in a
109109 program as required by Paragraph (B), Subdivision (2), Subsection
110110 (b), of this section.
111111 SECTION 5. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the Health
112112 and Human Services Commission shall make the information required
113113 by Section 531.0318, Government Code, as added by this Act,
114114 available through the Internet.
115115 (b) In developing the information required to be made
116116 available under this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission
117117 shall incorporate long-term care provider quality information
118118 reported through the Department of Aging and Disability Services
119119 Internet site, as well as other appropriate available information
120120 concerning the quality of services provided through the long-term
121121 care service delivery programs operated by that department.
122122 SECTION 6. If before implementing any provision of this Act
123123 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
124124 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
125125 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
126126 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
127127 waiver or authorization is granted.
128128 SECTION 7. If before implementing any provision of this Act
129129 a state agency determines that the implementation of the provision
130130 could result in a reduction or elimination of federal funding, the
131131 agency affected by the provision may delay implementing that
132132 provision, including by continuing to operate the consolidated
133133 waiver program otherwise eliminated by this Act, until the agency
134134 is notified by the federal government that the implementation will
135135 not result in a reduction or elimination of federal funding.
136136 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
137137 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
138138 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
139139 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
140140 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
141141 ______________________________ ______________________________
142142 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
143143 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 705 passed the Senate on
144144 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
145145 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
146146 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
147147 ______________________________
148148 Secretary of the Senate
149149 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 705 passed the House, with
150150 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
151151 Nays 0, one present not voting.
152152 ______________________________
153153 Chief Clerk of the House
154154 Approved:
155155 ______________________________
156156 Date
157157 ______________________________
158158 Governor