House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2123 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Amended | FA4 Davis | Journal Page: 2123 |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2123 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Motion to table fails | Journal Page: 2123 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Davis | Journal Page: 2123 |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2123 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2121 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2121 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 02/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |