Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB759 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 759


 AN ACT
 relating to certain standards for group-administered achievement
 tests used by school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.032, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to
 read as follows:
 (c) State and national norms of averages shall be computed
 using data that are not more than eight [six] years old at the time
 the assessment instrument is administered and that are
 representative of the group of students to whom the assessment
 instrument is administered.
 (c-1) The standardization norms computed under Subsection
 (c) shall be:
 (1) based on a national probability sample that meets
 accepted standards for educational and psychological testing; and
 (2) [shall be] updated at least every eight [six]
 years using proven psychometric procedures approved by the State
 Board of Education.
 (c-2)  The eight-year limitation on data to compute norms
 under this section does not apply if only data older than eight
 years is available for an assessment instrument. The commissioner
 by rule may limit the exception created by this subsection based on
 the type of assessment instrument.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a), (b), and (d), Section 39.032,
 Education Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 759 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 759 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor