E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
E | 05/21/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2726 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4301 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2646 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2726 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#965 | Journal Page: 3989 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3989 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3989 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3911 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3911 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |