Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R3627 SJM-D
 By: Nelson S.B. No. 790


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to clinical practice hours available for professional
 nursing educational programs at certain hospitals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 105, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 105.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.0021.  CLINICAL PRACTICE HOURS DATABASE; REPORTING
 REQUIREMENTS. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Hospital" has the meaning assigned by Section
 108.002.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (3)  "Reporting year" means a period beginning August 1
 and ending on the succeeding July 31.
 (b)  The council shall establish and maintain a database of
 clinical practice hours, disaggregated by hospital location, that
 are available at hospitals for professional nursing educational
 programs regulated by the Texas Board of Nursing that are offered at
 institutions of higher education in this state. The council shall
 administer the database through the nursing resource section of the
 health professions resource center created under Section 105.002.
 (c)  Not later than August 1 of each year, each hospital
 shall report to the nursing resource section:
 (1)  the projected number of clinical practice hours
 that will be available to professional nursing educational programs
 at institutions of higher education in this state at the hospital
 during the reporting year that begins on that August 1;
 (2)  the actual number of clinical practice hours that
 were available to professional nursing educational programs at the
 hospital during the preceding reporting year; and
 (3)  the actual number of clinical practice hours used
 by professional nursing educational programs at the hospital, by
 institution of higher education, during the preceding reporting
 year.
 (d)  The council may exempt from the reporting requirement in
 Subsection (c) a hospital that is unable to provide clinical
 practice hours to professional nursing educational programs.
 (e)  The nursing resource section shall report to
 professional nursing educational programs the following
 information disaggregated by hospital location:
 (1)  the actual number of clinical practice hours
 available during the preceding reporting year;
 (2)  the actual number of unused clinical practice
 hours during the preceding reporting year;
 (3)  the projected number of clinical practice hours
 available for the following reporting year; and
 (4)  a comparison of the variation between projected
 and available clinical practice hours for the preceding reporting
 year.
 (f)  Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 council shall submit a report to the legislature that:
 (1)  lists the number of unused clinical practice hours
 for reporting hospitals;
 (2)  identifies specific professional nursing
 educational programs at institutions of higher education that could
 be targeted for growth based on geographical proximity to
 facilities with unused clinical practice hours; and
 (3)  provides an analysis of the variation between
 projected and available clinical practice hours in preceding
 reporting years.
 (g)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission may adopt rules as necessary to administer this
 section.
 SECTION 2. Section 301.157, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The board by rule shall establish a range of clinical
 practice hours a nursing student enrolled in a school of nursing or
 educational program at an institution of higher education is
 required to complete to receive an initial license as a registered
 nurse in this state. In establishing the range of hours, the board
 shall consult with each institution of higher education that
 provides a school of nursing or educational program in this state
 and is regulated by the board. The board may vary the number of
 clinical practice hours required for a school of nursing or
 educational program based on the type of nursing degree offered by
 the school or program.
 SECTION 3. (a) The Texas Board of Nursing shall establish
 the range of clinical practice hours a professional nursing student
 is required to complete under Section 301.157(i), Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2010.
 (b) The range of clinical practice hours established by the
 Texas Board of Nursing under Section 301.157(i), Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act, applies only to a student who initially
 enrolls in a school of nursing or educational program at an
 institution of higher education on or after September 1, 2010. A
 student who was enrolled in a school of nursing or educational
 program at an institution of higher education before September 1,
 2010, and continues to be enrolled in the same school or program on
 or after that date is subject to the law in effect at the time of the
 student's initial enrollment in the school or program, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. This subsection
 expires August 31, 2016.
 (c) Notwithstanding Section 105.0021, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act:
 (1) a hospital shall submit the initial report
 required under Section 105.0021(c), Health and Safety Code, not
 later than August 1, 2010;
 (2) the nursing resource section of the health
 professions resource center shall report:
 (A) the information required under Sections
 105.0021(e)(1) through (3), Health and Safety Code, not later than
 November 1, 2010; and
 (B) the information required under Section
 105.0021(e)(4), Health and Safety Code, not later than November 1,
 2011; and
 (3) the statewide health coordinating council shall
 submit the initial report required under Section 105.0021(f)(3),
 Health and Safety Code, not later than January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.