1 | 1 | | By: Nelson S.B. No. 790 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to clinical practice hours available for professional |
---|
7 | 7 | | nursing educational programs at certain hospitals. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 105, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
10 | 10 | | by adding Section 105.0021 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 105.0021. CLINICAL PRACTICE HOURS DATABASE; REPORTING |
---|
12 | 12 | | REQUIREMENTS. (a) In this section: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) "Hospital" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
14 | 14 | | 108.002. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (2) "Institution of higher education" has the meaning |
---|
16 | 16 | | assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (3) "Reporting year" means a period beginning August 1 |
---|
18 | 18 | | and ending on the succeeding July 31. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The council shall establish and maintain a database of |
---|
20 | 20 | | clinical practice hours, disaggregated by hospital location, that |
---|
21 | 21 | | are available at hospitals for professional nursing educational |
---|
22 | 22 | | programs regulated by the Texas Board of Nursing that are offered at |
---|
23 | 23 | | institutions of higher education in this state. The council shall |
---|
24 | 24 | | administer the database through the nursing resource section of the |
---|
25 | 25 | | health professions resource center created under Section 105.002. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) Not later than August 1 of each year, each hospital |
---|
27 | 27 | | shall report to the nursing resource section: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) the projected number of clinical practice hours |
---|
29 | 29 | | that will be available to professional nursing educational programs |
---|
30 | 30 | | at institutions of higher education in this state at the hospital |
---|
31 | 31 | | during the reporting year that begins on that August 1; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) the actual number of clinical practice hours that |
---|
33 | 33 | | were available to professional nursing educational programs at the |
---|
34 | 34 | | hospital during the preceding reporting year; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (3) the actual number of clinical practice hours used |
---|
36 | 36 | | by professional nursing educational programs at the hospital, by |
---|
37 | 37 | | institution of higher education, during the preceding reporting |
---|
38 | 38 | | year. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) The nursing resource section may collect the data |
---|
40 | 40 | | required under Subsection (c) in the same manner and at the same |
---|
41 | 41 | | time other state-mandated data is collected. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (e) The council may exempt from the reporting requirement in |
---|
43 | 43 | | Subsection (c) a hospital that is unable to provide clinical |
---|
44 | 44 | | practice hours to professional nursing educational programs. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (f) The nursing resource section, using the most efficient |
---|
46 | 46 | | means available, shall report to professional nursing educational |
---|
47 | 47 | | programs the following information disaggregated by hospital |
---|
48 | 48 | | location: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) the actual number of clinical practice hours |
---|
50 | 50 | | available during the preceding reporting year; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) the actual number of unused clinical practice |
---|
52 | 52 | | hours during the preceding reporting year; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (3) the projected number of clinical practice hours |
---|
54 | 54 | | available for the following reporting year; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (4) the written comments submitted by each hospital |
---|
56 | 56 | | under Subsection (g); and |
---|
57 | 57 | | (5) a comparison of the variation between projected |
---|
58 | 58 | | and available clinical practice hours for the preceding reporting |
---|
59 | 59 | | year and any issues impacting the numbers of hours. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (g) When submitting clinical practice hours data to the |
---|
61 | 61 | | nursing resource section, a hospital may include in the hospital's |
---|
62 | 62 | | report concise written comments in the form prescribed by the |
---|
63 | 63 | | section regarding any issue impacting the number of hours reported. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (h) Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the |
---|
65 | 65 | | council shall submit a report to the legislature that: |
---|
66 | 66 | | (1) lists the number of unused clinical practice hours |
---|
67 | 67 | | for reporting hospitals; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) identifies specific professional nursing |
---|
69 | 69 | | educational programs at institutions of higher education that could |
---|
70 | 70 | | be targeted for growth based on geographical proximity to |
---|
71 | 71 | | facilities with unused clinical practice hours; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (3) includes a summary of the written comments |
---|
73 | 73 | | submitted by a hospital under Subsection (g); and |
---|
74 | 74 | | (4) provides an analysis of the variation between |
---|
75 | 75 | | projected and available clinical practice hours in preceding |
---|
76 | 76 | | reporting years and any issues impacting the numbers of hours. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (i) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
78 | 78 | | Services Commission may adopt rules as necessary to administer this |
---|
79 | 79 | | section. |
---|
80 | 80 | | SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 105.0021, Health and |
---|
81 | 81 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act: |
---|
82 | 82 | | (1) a hospital shall submit the initial report |
---|
83 | 83 | | required under Subsection (c), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety |
---|
84 | 84 | | Code, as added by this Act, not later than August 1, 2010; |
---|
85 | 85 | | (2) the nursing resource section of the health |
---|
86 | 86 | | professions resource center shall report: |
---|
87 | 87 | | (A) the information required under Subdivisions |
---|
88 | 88 | | (1) through (4), Subsection (f), Section 105.0021, Health and |
---|
89 | 89 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2010; |
---|
90 | 90 | | and |
---|
91 | 91 | | (B) the information required under Subdivision |
---|
92 | 92 | | (5), Subsection (f), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety Code, as |
---|
93 | 93 | | added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2011; and |
---|
94 | 94 | | (3) the statewide health coordinating council shall |
---|
95 | 95 | | submit the initial report required under Subdivision (4), |
---|
96 | 96 | | Subsection (h), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety Code, as added |
---|
97 | 97 | | by this Act, not later than January 1, 2013. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
99 | 99 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
100 | 100 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
101 | 101 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
102 | 102 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|