Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson S.B. No. 790


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to clinical practice hours available for professional
 nursing educational programs at certain hospitals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 105, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 105.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 105.0021.  CLINICAL PRACTICE HOURS DATABASE; REPORTING
 REQUIREMENTS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Hospital" has the meaning assigned by Section
 108.002.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (3)  "Reporting year" means a period beginning August 1
 and ending on the succeeding July 31.
 (b)  The council shall establish and maintain a database of
 clinical practice hours, disaggregated by hospital location, that
 are available at hospitals for professional nursing educational
 programs regulated by the Texas Board of Nursing that are offered at
 institutions of higher education in this state. The council shall
 administer the database through the nursing resource section of the
 health professions resource center created under Section 105.002.
 (c)  Not later than August 1 of each year, each hospital
 shall report to the nursing resource section:
 (1)  the projected number of clinical practice hours
 that will be available to professional nursing educational programs
 at institutions of higher education in this state at the hospital
 during the reporting year that begins on that August 1;
 (2)  the actual number of clinical practice hours that
 were available to professional nursing educational programs at the
 hospital during the preceding reporting year; and
 (3)  the actual number of clinical practice hours used
 by professional nursing educational programs at the hospital, by
 institution of higher education, during the preceding reporting
 year.
 (d)  The nursing resource section may collect the data
 required under Subsection (c) in the same manner and at the same
 time other state-mandated data is collected.
 (e)  The council may exempt from the reporting requirement in
 Subsection (c) a hospital that is unable to provide clinical
 practice hours to professional nursing educational programs.
 (f)  The nursing resource section, using the most efficient
 means available, shall report to professional nursing educational
 programs the following information disaggregated by hospital
 location:
 (1)  the actual number of clinical practice hours
 available during the preceding reporting year;
 (2)  the actual number of unused clinical practice
 hours during the preceding reporting year;
 (3)  the projected number of clinical practice hours
 available for the following reporting year;
 (4)  the written comments submitted by each hospital
 under Subsection (g); and
 (5)  a comparison of the variation between projected
 and available clinical practice hours for the preceding reporting
 year and any issues impacting the numbers of hours.
 (g)  When submitting clinical practice hours data to the
 nursing resource section, a hospital may include in the hospital's
 report concise written comments in the form prescribed by the
 section regarding any issue impacting the number of hours reported.
 (h)  Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 council shall submit a report to the legislature that:
 (1)  lists the number of unused clinical practice hours
 for reporting hospitals;
 (2)  identifies specific professional nursing
 educational programs at institutions of higher education that could
 be targeted for growth based on geographical proximity to
 facilities with unused clinical practice hours;
 (3)  includes a summary of the written comments
 submitted by a hospital under Subsection (g); and
 (4)  provides an analysis of the variation between
 projected and available clinical practice hours in preceding
 reporting years and any issues impacting the numbers of hours.
 (i)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission may adopt rules as necessary to administer this
 section.
 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 105.0021, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act:
 (1) a hospital shall submit the initial report
 required under Subsection (c), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than August 1, 2010;
 (2) the nursing resource section of the health
 professions resource center shall report:
 (A) the information required under Subdivisions
 (1) through (4), Subsection (f), Section 105.0021, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2010;
 and
 (B) the information required under Subdivision
 (5), Subsection (f), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2011; and
 (3) the statewide health coordinating council shall
 submit the initial report required under Subdivision (4),
 Subsection (h), Section 105.0021, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act, not later than January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.