Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB814 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Watson S.B. No. 814
22 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2009; March 4, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
44 May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 4, 2009, sent
66 to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 814 By: Duncan
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to physician education, including repayment assistance
1313 for certain physician education loans and requirements for family
1414 practice residency programs.
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1616 SECTION 1. Section 61.532, Education Code, is amended to
1717 read as follows:
1818 Sec. 61.532. ELIGIBILITY. (a) To be eligible to receive
1919 repayment assistance, a physician must apply to the coordinating
2020 board and have completed at least one year of medical practice:
2121 (1) in private practice in an economically depressed
2222 or rural medically underserved area of the state;
2323 (2) for one of the following state agencies:
2424 (A) the [Texas] Department of State Health
2525 Services;
2626 (B) the [Texas] Department of Aging and
2727 Disability Services [Mental Health and Mental Retardation];
2828 (C) the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
2929 [Corrections]; or
3030 (D) the Texas Youth Commission; [or]
3131 (3) for an approved family practice residency training
3232 program established under Subchapter I as a clinical faculty member
3333 and have completed training in an approved family practice
3434 residency training program on or after July 1, 1994; or
3535 (4) in primary care or in a medical specialty of acute
3636 physician shortage, as determined by the coordinating board in
3737 consultation with the Department of State Health Services, and in:
3838 (A) a hospital or clinic with a patient
3939 population of whom at least 50 percent are uninsured or receive
4040 Medicaid; or
4141 (B) a public hospital, as defined by Section
4242 61.002, Health and Safety Code.
4343 (b) The coordinating board may by rule provide for repayment
4444 assistance on a pro rata basis for physicians practicing as
4545 described by Subsection (a)(2), (3), or (4) on a part-time basis
4646 [for an approved family practice residency training program
4747 established under Subchapter I of this chapter or a state agency
4848 specified in Subsection (a) of this section].
4949 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 61.535, Education Code,
5050 is amended to read as follows:
5151 (a) The coordinating board shall deliver any repayment made
5252 under this subchapter in a lump sum payable:
5353 (1) to both the [lender and the] physician and the
5454 lender or other holder of the loan; or
5555 (2) on behalf of the physician, directly to the lender
5656 or other holder of the loan[, in accordance with federal law].
5757 SECTION 3. Section 61.536, Education Code, is amended to
5858 read as follows:
5959 Sec. 61.536. ADVISORY COMMITTEES. The coordinating board
6060 may:
6161 (1) appoint advisory committees from outside the
6262 board's membership to assist the board in performing its duties
6363 under this subchapter; and
6464 (2) request the assistance of the Department of State
6565 Health Services and the Family Practice Residency Advisory
6666 Committee in performing those duties.
6767 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 61.537, Education Code,
6868 is amended to read as follows:
6969 (a) The coordinating board shall adopt rules necessary for
7070 the administration of this subchapter, including rules [a rule]
7171 that:
7272 (1) provide for the commissioner of higher education
7373 to set an appropriate [sets a] maximum amount of repayment
7474 assistance that may be received by a physician in one year, except
7575 that the maximum amount of repayment assistance that may be
7676 received in one year by a physician who establishes eligibility
7777 under Section 61.532(a) may not exceed $35,000;
7878 (2) authorize [and a rule that authorizes] the
7979 Department of State Health Services [Family Practice Residency
8080 Advisory Committee] to establish priorities among eligible
8181 physicians for repayment assistance, by considering:
8282 (A) [taking into account] the degree of physician
8383 shortage;
8484 (B) [,] geographic locations;
8585 (C) [,] whether the physician is or will be
8686 providing service in an economically depressed or rural [a]
8787 medically underserved area or service as described by Section
8888 61.532(a)(4);[,] and
8989 (D) other criteria the department [committee]
9090 considers appropriate; and
9191 (3) administer the program under this subchapter in a
9292 manner that maximizes any matching funds available through the
9393 National Health Service Corps program of the United States
9494 Department of Health and Human Services.
9595 SECTION 5. Section 61.539, Education Code, is amended by
9696 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
9797 follows:
9898 (b) The amount set aside shall be transferred to the
9999 comptroller of public accounts to be maintained in the state
100100 treasury for the sole purpose of repayment of student loans of a
101101 physician serving:
102102 (1) in a designated state agency;
103103 (2) [or] in an area of this state that is economically
104104 depressed or that is a medically underserved area or health
105105 professional shortage area, as designated by the United States
106106 Department of Health and Human Services, that has a current
107107 shortage of physicians; or
108108 (3) as described by Section 61.532(a)(4).
109109 (b-1) Section 403.095, Government Code, does not apply to
110110 the amount set aside by this section.
111111 SECTION 6. Subsection (b), Section 51.918, Education Code,
112112 is amended to read as follows:
113113 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall:
114114 (1) encourage and coordinate the creation or expansion
115115 of a rural preceptor program among medical schools, teaching
116116 hospitals, nursing schools, and schools of allied health sciences;
117117 and
118118 (2) require family practice residency programs to
119119 provide an opportunity for residents to have a one-month rotation
120120 through:
121121 (A) a rural setting; [and]
122122 (B) a public health setting; or
123123 (C) an oncology setting.
124124 SECTION 7. As soon as practicable after the effective date
125125 of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
126126 adopt rules necessary to administer Subchapter J, Chapter 61,
127127 Education Code, as amended by this Act.
128128 SECTION 8. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
129129 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
130130 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
131131 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
132132 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
133133 provision.
134134 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
135135 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
136136 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
137137 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
138138 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
139139 * * * * *