Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB814 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 814
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2009; March 4, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 4, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 814 By: Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to physician education, including repayment assistance
 for certain physician education loans and requirements for family
 practice residency programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 61.532, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.532. ELIGIBILITY. (a) To be eligible to receive
 repayment assistance, a physician must apply to the coordinating
 board and have completed at least one year of medical practice:
 (1) in private practice in an economically depressed
 or rural medically underserved area of the state;
 (2) for one of the following state agencies:
 (A) the [Texas] Department of State Health
 Services;
 (B) the [Texas] Department of Aging and
 Disability Services [Mental Health and Mental Retardation];
 (C) the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 [Corrections]; or
 (D) the Texas Youth Commission; [or]
 (3) for an approved family practice residency training
 program established under Subchapter I as a clinical faculty member
 and have completed training in an approved family practice
 residency training program on or after July 1, 1994; or
 (4)  in primary care or in a medical specialty of acute
 physician shortage, as determined by the coordinating board in
 consultation with the Department of State Health Services, and in:
 (A)  a hospital or clinic with a patient
 population of whom at least 50 percent are uninsured or receive
 Medicaid; or
 (B)  a public hospital, as defined by Section
 61.002, Health and Safety Code.
 (b) The coordinating board may by rule provide for repayment
 assistance on a pro rata basis for physicians practicing as
 described by Subsection (a)(2), (3), or (4) on a part-time basis
 [for an approved family practice residency training program
 established under Subchapter I of this chapter or a state agency
 specified in Subsection (a) of this section].
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 61.535, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The coordinating board shall deliver any repayment made
 under this subchapter in a lump sum payable:
 (1) to both the [lender and the] physician and the
 lender or other holder of the loan; or
 (2)  on behalf of the physician, directly to the lender
 or other holder of the loan[, in accordance with federal law].
 SECTION 3. Section 61.536, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.536. ADVISORY COMMITTEES. The coordinating board
 may:
 (1) appoint advisory committees from outside the
 board's membership to assist the board in performing its duties
 under this subchapter; and
 (2) request the assistance of the Department of State
 Health Services and the Family Practice Residency Advisory
 Committee in performing those duties.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 61.537, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The coordinating board shall adopt rules necessary for
 the administration of this subchapter, including rules [a rule]
 that:
 (1)  provide for the commissioner of higher education
 to set an appropriate [sets a] maximum amount of repayment
 assistance that may be received by a physician in one year, except
 that the maximum amount of repayment assistance that may be
 received in one year by a physician who establishes eligibility
 under Section 61.532(a) may not exceed $35,000;
 (2) authorize [and a rule that authorizes] the
 Department of State Health Services [Family Practice Residency
 Advisory Committee] to establish priorities among eligible
 physicians for repayment assistance, by considering:
 (A) [taking into account] the degree of physician
 shortage;
 (B) [,] geographic locations;
 (C) [,] whether the physician is or will be
 providing service in an economically depressed or rural [a]
 medically underserved area or service as described by Section
 61.532(a)(4);[,] and
 (D) other criteria the department [committee]
 considers appropriate; and
 (3)  administer the program under this subchapter in a
 manner that maximizes any matching funds available through the
 National Health Service Corps program of the United States
 Department of Health and Human Services.
 SECTION 5. Section 61.539, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b) The amount set aside shall be transferred to the
 comptroller of public accounts to be maintained in the state
 treasury for the sole purpose of repayment of student loans of a
 physician serving:
 (1) in a designated state agency;
 (2) [or] in an area of this state that is economically
 depressed or that is a medically underserved area or health
 professional shortage area, as designated by the United States
 Department of Health and Human Services, that has a current
 shortage of physicians; or
 (3) as described by Section 61.532(a)(4).
 (b-1) Section 403.095, Government Code, does not apply to
 the amount set aside by this section.
 SECTION 6. Subsection (b), Section 51.918, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall:
 (1) encourage and coordinate the creation or expansion
 of a rural preceptor program among medical schools, teaching
 hospitals, nursing schools, and schools of allied health sciences;
 and
 (2) require family practice residency programs to
 provide an opportunity for residents to have a one-month rotation
 through:
 (A) a rural setting; [and]
 (B) a public health setting; or
 (C) an oncology setting.
 SECTION 7. As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt rules necessary to administer Subchapter J, Chapter 61,
 Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 8. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *