E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5983
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#991
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4097
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4027
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 4027
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4027
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 599
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
Senate
|
02/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|