Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB833 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 833


 AN ACT
 relating to the accrual of vacation and sick leave for certain state
 employees during a military leave of absence and to the eligibility
 of military service members to hold state office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 661.904,
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) The employee on an unpaid leave of absence during
 military duty described by Subsection (a) continues to accrue:
 (1) state service credit for purposes of longevity
 pay;
 (2) [while on military duty described by Subsection
 (a) but does not accrue] vacation leave; and
 (3) [or] sick leave [during an unpaid leave of
 absence].
 (c) The employee may retain any accrued vacation or sick
 leave and is entitled to be credited with those balances on return
 to state employment from military duty described by Subsection (a).
 Leave earned while on an unpaid leave of absence during military
 duty described by Subsection (a) [in a state-paid status] is
 credited to the employee's balance when the employee returns to
 active state employment.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 431, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 431.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.0055. DUAL OFFICE HOLDING. A position in or
 membership in the state military forces is not considered to be a
 civil office of emolument.
 SECTION 3. Section 1 of this Act takes effect immediately if
 this Act receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to
 each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, Section 1 of this Act takes effect September 1,
 2009. Section 2 of this Act takes effect January 1, 2010, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, authorizing an officer or enlisted member of
 the Texas State Guard or other state militia or military force to
 hold other civil offices is approved by the voters. If that
 proposed constitutional amendment is not approved by the voters,
 Section 2 of this Act has no effect.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 833 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 833 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor