Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB874 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 874


 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain counties from the drainage
 charge imposed by a municipal drainage utility system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 552.053, Local Government Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (e)  Property owned by a county in which a municipality
 described by Section 552.044(8)(A) is located is exempt from
 drainage charges under Section 552.047 and all ordinances,
 resolutions, and rules adopted under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a charge assessed, billed, or collected by a municipality on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A charge assessed, billed, or
 collected by a municipality before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the charge was assessed,
 billed, or collected, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the House on
 May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor