E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4241
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2638
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1009
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 427
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 427
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|