Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB891 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 891


 AN ACT
 relating to the public school physical education curriculum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) and amending Subsection (l) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  The physical education curriculum required under
 Subsection (a)(2)(C) must be sequential, developmentally
 appropriate, and designed, implemented, and evaluated to enable
 students to develop the motor, self-management, and other skills,
 knowledge, attitudes, and confidence necessary to participate in
 physical activity throughout life. Each school district shall
 establish specific objectives and goals the district intends to
 accomplish through the physical education curriculum. In
 identifying the essential knowledge and skills of physical
 education, the State Board of Education shall ensure that the
 curriculum:
 (1)  emphasizes the knowledge and skills capable of
 being used during a lifetime of regular physical activity;
 (2)  is consistent with national physical education
 standards for:
 (A)  the information that students should learn
 about physical activity; and
 (B)  the physical activities that students should
 be able to perform;
 (3)  requires that, on a weekly basis, at least 50
 percent of the physical education class be used for actual student
 physical activity and that the activity be, to the extent
 practicable, at a moderate or vigorous level;
 (4)  offers students an opportunity to choose among
 many types of physical activity in which to participate;
 (5)  offers students both cooperative and competitive
 games;
 (6)  meets the needs of students of all physical
 ability levels, including students who have a disability, chronic
 health problem, or other special need that precludes the student
 from participating in regular physical education instruction but
 who might be able to participate in physical education that is
 suitably adapted and, if applicable, included in the student's
 individualized education program;
 (7)  takes into account the effect that gender and
 cultural differences might have on the degree of student interest
 in physical activity or on the types of physical activity in which a
 student is interested;
 (8) teaches self-management and movement skills;
 (9)  teaches cooperation, fair play, and responsible
 participation in physical activity;
 (10)  promotes student participation in physical
 activity outside of school; and
 (11)  allows physical education classes to be an
 enjoyable experience for students.
 (l) A school district shall require a student enrolled in
 full-day prekindergarten, in kindergarten, or in a grade level
 below grade six to participate in moderate or vigorous daily
 physical activity for at least 30 minutes throughout the school
 year as part of the district's physical education curriculum or
 through structured activity during a school campus's daily recess.
 To the extent practicable, a school district shall require a
 student enrolled in prekindergarten on less than a full-day basis
 to participate in the same type and amount of physical activity as a
 student enrolled in full-day prekindergarten. A school district
 shall require students enrolled in grade levels six, seven, and
 eight to participate in moderate or vigorous daily physical
 activity for at least 30 minutes for at least four semesters during
 those grade levels as part of the district's physical education
 curriculum. If a school district determines, for any particular
 grade level below grade six, that requiring moderate or vigorous
 daily physical activity is impractical due to scheduling concerns
 or other factors, the district may as an alternative require a
 student in that grade level to participate in moderate or vigorous
 physical activity for at least 135 minutes during each school week.
 Additionally, a school district may as an alternative require a
 student enrolled in a grade level for which the district uses block
 scheduling to participate in moderate or vigorous physical activity
 for at least 225 minutes during each period of two school weeks. A
 school district must provide for an exemption for:
 (1) any student who is unable to participate in the
 required physical activity because of illness or disability; and
 (2) a middle school or junior high school student who
 participates in an extracurricular activity with a moderate or
 vigorous physical activity component that is considered a
 structured activity under rules adopted by the commissioner.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 25, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.114.  STUDENT/TEACHER RATIOS IN PHYSICAL EDUCATION
 CLASSES; CLASS SIZE. (a)  In implementing the curriculum for
 physical education under Section 28.002(a)(2)(C), each school
 district shall establish specific objectives and goals the district
 intends to accomplish through the curriculum, including, to the
 extent practicable, student/teacher ratios that are small enough to
 enable the district to:
 (1)  carry out the purposes of and requirements for the
 physical education curriculum as provided under Section 28.002(d);
 and
 (2)  ensure the safety of students participating in
 physical education.
 (b)  If a district establishes a student to teacher ratio
 greater than 45 to 1 in a physical education class, the district
 shall specifically identify the manner in which the safety of the
 students will be maintained.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (l), Section 28.002, Education Code,
 as amended by this Act, applies beginning with the 2009-2010 school
 year.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 891 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 891 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 113,
 Nays 25, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor