E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB2899
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 822
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 428
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 428
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|