House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2158 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1757 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1713 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1144 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1072 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 737 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |