1 | 1 | | By: Williams S.B. No. 913 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 14, 2009, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 913 By: Uresti |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the authority of the Lower Neches Valley Authority to |
---|
13 | 13 | | acquire, own, operate, maintain, and improve the Devers Canal |
---|
14 | 14 | | System, its water rights, and associated property. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 63, Acts of the 43rd Legislature, 1st |
---|
17 | 17 | | Called Session, 1933, is amended by adding Section 13C to read as |
---|
18 | 18 | | follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 13C. (a) In this section: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) "Canal system" means the canal system and |
---|
21 | 21 | | associated properties generally known as the Devers Canal System. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on |
---|
23 | 23 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) "Navigation district" means the Chambers-Liberty |
---|
25 | 25 | | Counties Navigation District. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) The district may: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) acquire, own, operate, maintain, and improve the |
---|
28 | 28 | | canal system; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) enlarge and extend the canal system east of the |
---|
30 | 30 | | Trinity River in Chambers, Liberty, and Jefferson Counties. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) The district may own the water rights and appropriate |
---|
32 | 32 | | and divert water of this state under the permits and contracts |
---|
33 | 33 | | previously owned by and acquired from the Devers Canal Rice |
---|
34 | 34 | | Producers Association, Incorporated. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) Except as provided by Subsection (e) of this section, |
---|
36 | 36 | | the district may distribute, sell, and use water of this state for |
---|
37 | 37 | | any purpose approved by the commission. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) Before entering into a contract to sell or provide water |
---|
39 | 39 | | for any use other than irrigation in Chambers County outside the |
---|
40 | 40 | | district's boundaries that the navigation district had authority to |
---|
41 | 41 | | provide or sell under the navigation district's water rights on |
---|
42 | 42 | | May 1, 2009, the district must: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) send to the navigation district a written notice |
---|
44 | 44 | | of intent to sell or provide water for nonirrigation use in Chambers |
---|
45 | 45 | | County outside the district's boundaries; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) allow the navigation district 30 days to exercise |
---|
47 | 47 | | a right of first refusal to provide the water. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (f) The navigation district may exercise its right of first |
---|
49 | 49 | | refusal under Subsection (e) of this section by delivering to the |
---|
50 | 50 | | district notice that it intends to exercise that right not later |
---|
51 | 51 | | than the 30th day after the date the navigation district receives |
---|
52 | 52 | | the notice of intent under Subsection (e) of this section. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (g) The district may enter into a contract described by |
---|
54 | 54 | | Subsection (e) of this section only if the navigation district: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (1) fails to comply with Subsection (f) of this |
---|
56 | 56 | | section; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (2) complies with Subsection (f) of this section and |
---|
58 | 58 | | does not enter into a contract to sell or otherwise provide water |
---|
59 | 59 | | for the use described by the district's notice of intent under |
---|
60 | 60 | | Subsection (e) of this section before the expiration of four months |
---|
61 | 61 | | after the date the navigation district receives the notice of |
---|
62 | 62 | | intent. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
64 | 64 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
65 | 65 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
66 | 66 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
67 | 67 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
68 | 68 | | * * * * * |
---|