Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB913 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Williams S.B. No. 913
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 913 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Lower Neches Valley Authority to
 acquire, own, operate, maintain, and improve the Devers Canal
 System, its water rights, and associated property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 63, Acts of the 43rd Legislature, 1st
 Called Session, 1933, is amended by adding Section 13C to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 13C. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Canal system" means the canal system and
 associated properties generally known as the Devers Canal System.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (3)  "Navigation district" means the Chambers-Liberty
 Counties Navigation District.
 (b) The district may:
 (1)  acquire, own, operate, maintain, and improve the
 canal system; and
 (2)  enlarge and extend the canal system east of the
 Trinity River in Chambers, Liberty, and Jefferson Counties.
 (c)  The district may own the water rights and appropriate
 and divert water of this state under the permits and contracts
 previously owned by and acquired from the Devers Canal Rice
 Producers Association, Incorporated.
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (e) of this section,
 the district may distribute, sell, and use water of this state for
 any purpose approved by the commission.
 (e)  Before entering into a contract to sell or provide water
 for any use other than irrigation in Chambers County outside the
 district's boundaries that the navigation district had authority to
 provide or sell under the navigation district's water rights on
 May 1, 2009, the district must:
 (1)  send to the navigation district a written notice
 of intent to sell or provide water for nonirrigation use in Chambers
 County outside the district's boundaries; and
 (2)  allow the navigation district 30 days to exercise
 a right of first refusal to provide the water.
 (f)  The navigation district may exercise its right of first
 refusal under Subsection (e) of this section by delivering to the
 district notice that it intends to exercise that right not later
 than the 30th day after the date the navigation district receives
 the notice of intent under Subsection (e) of this section.
 (g)  The district may enter into a contract described by
 Subsection (e) of this section only if the navigation district:
 (1)  fails to comply with Subsection (f) of this
 section; or
 (2)  complies with Subsection (f) of this section and
 does not enter into a contract to sell or otherwise provide water
 for the use described by the district's notice of intent under
 Subsection (e) of this section before the expiration of four months
 after the date the navigation district receives the notice of
 intent.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *