Senate | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 32 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |